U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00969
  • Case Name: Bailey et al v. Franklin Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 29, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 05, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.