U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00966
  • Case Name: Radian LLC v. Radiance Medical Aesthetics LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 20, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report Regarding Patent and Trademark]
  • September 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.