U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00968
  • Case Name: Young v. Midland Credit Management Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order for Response]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.