U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00964
  • Case Name: Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • May 24, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 20, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • September 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.