U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00962
  • Case Name: Cactus Drilling Company LLC et al v. Reme LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 14, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.