U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00958
  • Case Name: Del City Joint Venture LLC v. Steadfast Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 29, 2021: [Leave]
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 18, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.