U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00972
  • Case Name: Eighty Ninth Center LLC v. Sentinel Insurance Company LTD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 18, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 05, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.