U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00960
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 08, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 30, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2021: [Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.