U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00973
  • Case Name: Jordan-Waddell v. GC Services Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.