U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00961
  • Case Name: Pilson v. Canavan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 01, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 01, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 01, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.