U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00977
  • Case Name: Flash90 LTD v. Black Belt Magazine 1000 LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 21, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.