U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00980
  • Case Name: Strickland v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 02, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 10, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • November 04, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [Clarify]
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.