U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00981
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
  • January 20, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 20, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 05, 2023: [Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.