U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00984
  • Case Name: Potts et al v. Gulfport Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 14, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Joint Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 01, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 01, 2022: [Stay Case]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.