U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00985
  • Case Name: Heger v. Oklahoma State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 04, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended)]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 07, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 07, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.