U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00986
  • Case Name: Fields v. Great Lakes Insurance SE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 16, 2022: [Supplement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 07, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 07, 2022: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 01, 2022: [Objections]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 21, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 06, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 13, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.