U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00988
  • Case Name: Harris v. Canadian County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 07, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 07, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.