U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00987
  • Case Name: Williams v. Hoss Consulting Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 07, 2022: [Leave]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • May 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.