U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00991
  • Case Name: Loveless v. Statewide Collection
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.