U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00990
  • Case Name: Doh v. Phoenix Financial Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 11, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.