U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00992
  • Case Name: Mays v. Grady County Law Enforcement Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 12, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.