U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00998
  • Case Name: Brown v. Intrust Bank NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 13, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.