U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00996
  • Case Name: Stevenson et al v. Cleveland Integrity Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Stay Case]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 12, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.