U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00999
  • Case Name: Redfearn v. Hearell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 13, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 12, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.