U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00994
  • Case Name: Safe and Sound LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 03, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 12, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.