U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00995
  • Case Name: Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 04, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.