U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01000
  • Case Name: Stouffer v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [CJA 30 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter - Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 28, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • November 24, 2021: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 19, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2021: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • November 18, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • November 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • November 12, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • November 12, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 11, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.