U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00997
  • Case Name: Bostic v. Vintage at 50th Apartment
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.