U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01002
  • Case Name: Leichliter v. Optio Solutions LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 20, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 11, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 30, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 27, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 26, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Seal]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • May 25, 2022: [Leave]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 11, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.