U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01003
  • Case Name: Shields v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • October 18, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 14, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.