U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01009
  • Case Name: Glasco-Parish v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 10, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.