U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01007
  • Case Name: Farley v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Leave]
  • December 16, 2021: [Leave]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Objections]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 15, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.