U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01010
  • Case Name: Pratt v. Walmart Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 05, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 03, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
  • January 01, 2023: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 27, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • December 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 04, 2022: [Compel]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Quash]
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 05, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 18, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 15, 2021: [Complaint]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.