U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01011
  • Case Name: Liles v. Department of the Navy Board for Correction of Naval Records
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.