U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01008
  • Case Name: Crenwelge v. Hammond et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.