U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01014
  • Case Name: Davison v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Stay Case]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 28, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • November 22, 2022: [Expedite]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Death Penalty)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Other Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 18, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 18, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.