U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01013
  • Case Name: Cottonham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 17, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Surreply]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 08, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.