U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01020
  • Case Name: Chaparral Energy LLC v. Tenn-Tex Partners LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 24, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • November 23, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • November 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 01, 2021: [Jury Demand]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 19, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.