U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01022
  • Case Name: Black Emergency Response Team et al v. OConnor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay Case]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Leave]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 14, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Supplement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Leave]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Substitute Party]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 12, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Strike]
  • December 16, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • November 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.