U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01018
  • Case Name: Scott v. The City of Oklahoma City
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 21, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 21, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.