U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01016
  • Case Name: Abdulhaseeb v. LNU
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • October 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 06, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 25, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order for Response]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • November 08, 2021: [Receipt]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 19, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 19, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.