U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01021
  • Case Name: Spitz v. CSAA General Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 03, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed as to Non-party]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 25, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 07, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 07, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 23, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 08, 2021: [Leave]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 29, 2021: [Supplement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.