U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01023
  • Case Name: Mathews v. Elhabte
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 22, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 10, 2021: [Receipt]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 20, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.