U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01025
  • Case Name: Huskey v. Payne County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 10, 2022: [Special Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 28, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • November 19, 2021: [Receipt]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 20, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 20, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.