U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01028
  • Case Name: Davis v. Nunn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 21, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 23, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 22, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
  • June 22, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Receipt]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.