U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01027
  • Case Name: Perez v. Girl Scouts-Western Oklahoma Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 21, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.