U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01026
  • Case Name: Bley v. Independent School District No I-002 of Oklahoma County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 07, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 23, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 12, 2022: [Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 04, 2022: [Leave]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.