U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01031
  • Case Name: Clift v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • June 14, 2022: [Remand]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.