U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01033
  • Case Name: Pittman v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • May 18, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 19, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 03, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 22, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.