U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01037
  • Case Name: Maurice v. Account Management Resources LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.